GA HB171 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate Notice to Reconsider
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate Notice to Reconsider
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to horns, exhaust systems, mirrors, windshields, tires, safety belts, and energy absorption systems of motor vehicles, so as to allow for the use of mounts on windshields of motor vehicles for the support of wireless telecommunications devices and stand-alone electronic devices under certain circumstances; to provide for an exception; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; use of mounts on windshields for the support of wireless telecommunications devices and stand-alone electronic devices under certain circumstances; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #257 (Y: 20 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #258 (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #259 (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #260 (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #261 (Y: 30 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #262 (Y: 27 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #90 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #258 (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #259 (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #260 (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #261 (Y: 30 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #262 (Y: 27 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #90 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Notice to Reconsider |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Hopper |