GA HB177 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitations of actions on recovery for deficiencies connected with improvements to realty and resulting injuries, so as to change when the statute of limitations shall accrue for certain actions arising from burial of construction waste or materials; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Civil practice; certain actions arising from burial of construction waste or materials; change when statute of limitations shall accrue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |