GA HB180 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend various titles of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to repeal provisions creating inactive boards, panels, authorities, centers, commissions, committees, councils, task forces, and other such bodies; to remove inapplicable references; to provide for a revision; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Official Code of Georgia Annotated; amend various titles; repeal provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback