GA HB195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 7 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement, retirement allowances, disability benefits, and death benefits relative to the Georgia Firefighters' Pension Fund, so as to increase the benefit amount payable to beneficiaries after the member's death; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Firefighters' Pension Fund; increase benefit amount payable to beneficiaries after the member's death
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #675 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Vote #457 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Vote #457 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 370 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |