GA HB2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding parks, historic areas, memorials, and recreation, so as to revise provisions of law regarding the use or possession of any handgun in a park, historic site, or recreational area; to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to carrying and possession of firearms; to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to transportation passenger safety, so as to revise provisions of law regarding the carrying of firearms; to amend Title 27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to game and fish, so as to revise certain laws regarding the carrying of firearms; to amend Part 2 of Article 10 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to parking for persons with disabilities, so as to revise certain laws regarding the carrying of firearms; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Constitutional Carry Act of 2019; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gurtler [R] | Sen. Colton Moore [R] | Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] |
Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. David Stover [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House Hopper |
2018-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |