GA HB202 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to penal institutions, so as to require the commissioner of corrections to report certain information regarding the immigration status, offenses, and home countries of persons who are confined under the authority of the Department of Corrections; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Penal institutions; commissioner of corrections to report certain information; require
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |