GA HB206 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 26-4-118 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, "The Pharmacy Audit Bill of Rights," so as to remove an exception relating to certain audits conducted by the Department of Community Health; to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to provide that clerical or other errors do not constitute a basis to recoup payments made by providers of medical assistance; to provide for a correction period; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
The Pharmacy Audit Bill of Rights; certain audits conducted by the Department of Community Health; remove exception; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Vote #428 (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #365 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Vote #76 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #365 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Vote #76 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 68 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hopper |