GA HB215 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-3-114 and Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to policies to guide Department of Natural Resources in creating and administering the Georgia Scenic Trails System and to motor vehicles and traffic, respectively, so as to provide for permitted operation of electric assisted bicycles; to authorize the Department of Natural Resources to designate certain trails as open for use of electric assisted bicycles; to provide for definitions; to provide for required equipment and identification for such devices; to provide for operating standards; to provide for use of such devices on bicycle lanes and paths in certain instances; to provide for use of protective headgear in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Scenic Trails System; electric assisted bicycles; provide for permitted operation
Sponsors
Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Bee Nguyen [D] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Hopper |