GA HB216 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting and supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate for members of the Georgia Tennis Foundation; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Georgia Tennis Foundation; establish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #563 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Hopper |