GA HB227 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-6-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to enumeration of unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices regarding insurance, so as to expand prohibitions on discrimination against victims of family violence to include victims of sexual assault; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; discrimination against victims of family violence to include victims of sexual assault; expand prohibitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #242 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #243 (Y: 17 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #244 (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #160 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 273
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-11HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback