GA HB245 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-17-80 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement benefit options, payment to surviving spouse, requirements, effect of reemployment, effect of changes in retirement benefits, and payment on death of member relative to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, so as to remove a provision that requires certain benefits payable to a surviving spouse to terminate if such surviving spouse remarries; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peace Officers' Annuity Fund; require certain benefits payable to a surviving spouse to terminate if such surviving spouse remarries; remove a provision
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] |
Sen. Gail Davenport [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #564 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #564 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 467 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House Hopper |