GA HB25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 4 of Title 10 and Chapter 1 of Title 13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to self-service storage facilities and general provisions regarding contracts, respectively, so as to provide military service members civil relief concerning certain contractual obligations due to circumstances of active duty; to update a cross-reference; to provide for definitions; to enhance service member consumer protections under the law to include certain television, video, and audio programming services, internet access services, and health spa services; to provide for conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts; provide military service members civil relief concerning certain contractual obligations due to circumstances of active duty

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #360 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #236 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Vote #32 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-04-23 Act 39
2019-04-23HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-11HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-17HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback