GA HB257 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to magistrate courts, so as to increase the authority by which the Council of Magistrate Court Judges can organize itself and provide for officers; to remove outdated provisions; to revise the bond amount required for each magistrate; to revise qualifications of magistrates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Council of Magistrate Court Judges; organization and provide for officers; increase authority
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #111 (Y: 158 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #111 (Y: 158 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 227 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Postponed |
2019-02-28 | House | House Postponed |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House Hopper |