GA HB26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 39 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to psychologists, so as to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact"; to authorize the State Board of Examiners of Psychologists to administer the compact in this state; to revise provisions relating to exceptions to licensure; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; enter into an interstate compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #252 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Vote #72 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23 Effective Date
2019-04-23 Act 36
2019-04-23HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-17HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback