GA HB266 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to computation of taxable net income, so as to revise the deduction from income for contributions to savings trust accounts established pursuant to Article 11 of Chapter 3 of Title 20; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income for contributions to savings trust accounts; revise deduction
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #298 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #125 (Y: 95 N: 64 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #298 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #125 (Y: 95 N: 64 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 142 | |
2019-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Hopper |