GA HB277 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to allow good will from insurer acquisitions to be treated as an asset; to allow mutual insurers to charge policyholder dividends directly to surplus; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; allow good will from insurer acquisitions to be treated as an asset

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #375 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #347 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #92 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 274
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback