GA HB279 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state administrative organization, so as to provide that law enforcement officers appointed by the state revenue commissioner as special agents or enforcement officers of the Department of Revenue may use department motor vehicles or equipment relative to certain approved off-duty jobs; to provide for criteria; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for restrictions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; certain law enforcement officers may use department vehicles relative to certain approved off-duty jobs; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #376 (Y: 151 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #212 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Vote #100 (Y: 149 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #212 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Vote #100 (Y: 149 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Veto V4 | |
2019-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Hopper |