GA HB292 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16, Code Section 35-3-34, and Chapter 1 of Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying and possession of firearms, disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses, resulting responsibility and liability of issuing center, and provision of certain information to the FBI in conjunction with the National Instant Criminal Background Check System, and general provisions regarding torts, respectively, so as to provide for, revise, and clarify laws relating to the carrying of weapons and safety; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Firearms; laws relating to the carrying of weapons and safety; revise and clarify
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Rep. Vernon Jones [D] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #251 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #261 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #364 (Y: 110 N: 49 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #180 (Y: 127 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #261 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #364 (Y: 110 N: 49 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #180 (Y: 127 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 217 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hopper |