GA HB297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the office of elected county surveyor of Monroe County; to provide for the appointment of a county surveyor by the governing authority of the county; to provide that the person currently serving as elected county surveyor shall serve out the remainder of his or her term; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Monroe County; abolish office of elected county surveyor; provide appointment by governing authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #74 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 110 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House Hopper |