GA HB298 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 1 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to restrictions and prohibitions on membership in public retirement or pension systems, so as to modify the manner and timing for the deduction or cessation of payments owed by a public employee as a result of public employment related crimes; to increase the time in which a public retirement system shall initiate certain administrative proceedings upon the conviction of a member or beneficiary of a public employment related crime; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement and pensions; deduction or cessation of payments owed by a public employee as a result of public employment related crimes; modify manner and timing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-13 | Effective Date | |
2019-02-13 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54938 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/181348 |