GA HB3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the excise tax on rooms, lodgings, and accommodations, so as to repeal a certain tax on innkeepers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Excise tax; certain tax on innkeepers; repeal
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gurtler [R] | Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Sen. Colton Moore [R] |
Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |
2018-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |