GA HB300 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 31 and Chapter 45 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to continuing care providers and facilities and state health planning and development, so as to redesignate continuing care retirement communities as life plan communities; to revise definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; redesignate continuing care retirement communities as life plan communities
Sponsors
Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Edward Stephens [D] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #115 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #115 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 303 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House Hopper |