GA HB306 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the membership of the Board of Education of Cherokee County, approved April 17, 1973 (Ga. L. 1973, p. 3207), as amended, so as to change provisions relating to the compensation of the members of said board of education; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cherokee County; Board of Education; change compensation of members
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Rep. John Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #194 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-02 | Act 85 | |
2017-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hopper |