GA HB315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 80 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, so as to provide for certain agreements from consultants who enter into contracts or arrangements with counties, municipalities, and other local governmental entities to prepare or develop specifications or requirements for bids, requests for proposals, procurement orders, or purchasing orders; to provide a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; certain agreements from consultants who enter into contracts or arrangements to prepare or develop requirements for bids; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #378 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #267 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #205 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #267 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #205 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-17 | Act 26 | |
2019-04-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House Hopper |