GA HB317 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-17-8.2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to requirement for orderly, clean, and sanitary receptacles, notice, and penalty for violations, so as to transfer jurisdiction of a petition filed regarding the removal of collection receptacles from the superior court to the city or municipal court; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collection receptacles; transfer jurisdiction of removal petition from superior court to city or municipal court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback