GA HB319 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 7 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement, retirement allowances, disability benefits, and death benefits relative to the Georgia Firefighters' Pension Fund, so as to provide that a member's benefits payable after death shall be paid to his or her estate when such member failed to designate a beneficiary or his or her designated beneficiaries are deceased; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Firefighters' Pension Fund; member's benefits payable after death shall be paid to his or her estate when such member failed to designate a beneficiary or his or her designated beneficiaries are deceased; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #362 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #86 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 248
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-18SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse Postponed
2019-02-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback