GA HB32 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3A of Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to turnaround schools, so as to revise and clarify certain provisions relating to the duties of the Chief Turnaround Officer; to revise the term "turnaround coach" to "transformation specialist"; to revise biannual reporting dates; to provide for the establishment of the Georgia Turnaround Collaborative; to provide for stipends for turnaround instructional innovation specialists; to provide for criteria; to provide for retention of stipend; to provide for conversion of stipend to permanent salary increase; to provide for contingency based on appropriations by the General Assembly; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; duties of the Chief Turnaround Officer; revise and clarify certain provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback