GA HB322 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government, so as to change provisions relating to the advertisement of certain bid or proposal opportunities; to change notice provisions relating to public works construction contracts; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; advertisement of certain bid or proposal opportunities; change provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #408 (Y: 91 N: 69 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #409 (Y: 83 N: 78 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #410 (Y: 84 N: 74 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #422 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #300 (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #301 (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #82 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28 Effective Date
2019-04-28 Act 64
2019-04-28HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Receded from Amend or Sub
2019-04-02SenateSenate Reconsidered
2019-04-02SenateSenate Insisted
2019-04-02HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-04-02HouseHouse Reconsidered
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback