GA HB325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-8-7.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to authority of council to refuse certificate to applicant or to discipline council certified officer or exempt officer, grounds, restoration of certificate, emergency suspension of certification, and notice of investigation, so as to provide that records of investigation of an officer by the Georgia Peace Officer Standards and Training Council shall be retained for 30 years; to provide for destruction of such records; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Law enforcement officers and agencies; records of investigation of an officer by the Georgia Peace Officer Standards and Training Council shall be retained for 30 years; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #209 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #174 (Y: 147 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #174 (Y: 147 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 72 | |
2019-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Hopper |