GA HB329 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 42-8-34.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revocation of probated and suspended sentences, so as to change provisions relating to the maximum period of revocation after commission of a crime; to provide that for this purpose.
Title
Probated or suspended sentences; maximum period of revocation; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Rep. John Hatfield [R] |
Rep. Tom Knox [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Sen. John Wiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #763 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #143 - Pass (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #143 - Pass (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 426 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House First Readers |