GA HB336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement allowances, disability benefits, and spouses' benefits, so as to require certain public employers to make employer and employee contributions to the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia for beneficiaries employed by such certain public employers; to permit beneficiaries to return to service full-time as teachers without affecting their benefits; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement and pensions; require certain public employers to make employer and employee contributions to the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia for beneficiaries employed by such certain public employers
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #637 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-18 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Hopper |