GA HB337 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-16-101 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement benefit options under the Sheriffs' Retirement Fund of Georgia, failure of a member to select an option, effect of changes in retirement benefits and options, and change of option after receipt of payments, so as to provide that in the event of divorce a retired member who has elected a spouses' option may elect to continue or revoke such coverage; to provide for an increase in benefit; to provide for remarriage; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sheriffs' Retirement Fund of Georgia; divorced member option to continue coverage; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #799 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Vote #445 - Passage (Y: 95 N: 58 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Vote #445 - Passage (Y: 95 N: 58 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 652 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-01-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-01-31 | House Third Readers | |
2012-01-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-28 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House First Readers |