GA HB337 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 11, 15, 44, and 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Uniform Commercial Code, clerks of superior courts, property, and revenue and taxation, respectively, so as to modernize provisions relating to the transmittal, filing, recording, access to, and territorial effect of tax liens issued by the Department of Revenue; to provide for definitions; to provide for modern technological advances in electronic record keeping relating to the filing and public access to state tax liens; to provide for certificates of clearance for state tax liens; to provide for duties and responsibilities of the Georgia Superior Court Clerks' Cooperative Authority; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters, to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Tax Execution Modernization Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Sen. Michael Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #205 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #150 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #150 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 257 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House Hopper |