GA HB337 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for and regulate peer-to-peer vehicle sharing; to provide for definitions; to provide requirements for a peer-to-peer vehicle-sharing program; to establish safety recall and insurance requirements for such program; to prohibit the promulgation and enforcement of certain regulations by local governments as related to such program; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Peer-to-Peer Car-Sharing Program Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #784 (Y: 152 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #712 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #167 (Y: 159 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #712 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #167 (Y: 159 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 488 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read Tabled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Hopper |