GA HB341 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-8-60 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to reproduction of recorded material, transfer, sale, distribution, circulation, civil forfeiture, and restitution, so as to update terminology; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; reproduction of recorded material; update terminology
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Beth Moore [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #645 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #88 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #88 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 489 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Hopper |