GA HB346 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to landlord and tenant generally, so as to prohibit retaliation by a landlord against a tenant for taking certain actions; to provide for circumstances that are not considered retaliation; to provide for remedies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; prohibit retaliation by a landlord against a tenant for taking certain actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #348 (Y: 125 N: 28 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #311 (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #312 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #139 (Y: 131 N: 25 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-05-08 Act 311
2019-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-28SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-26SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-19HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/346
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/181736.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183517.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183922.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/185238.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/186237.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/186630.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/187010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16702
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17096
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17095
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17118

Bill Comments

feedback