GA HB35 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use taxes, so as to create an exemption from state sales and use tax for certain poultry diagnostic and disease monitoring services; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; certain poultry diagnostic and disease monitoring services; create exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] |
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #195 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #196 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Vote #48 (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #196 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Vote #48 (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-18 | Act 34 | |
2019-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Postponed |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-17 | House | House Hopper |