GA HB357 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration, operation, and sale of watercraft, so as to provide for the titling of certain vessels; to provide for procedures with regard to titling such vessels; to provide for legislative intent and findings; to provide a short title; to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding sales and use taxes, so as to provide for a cap on the sales and use tax on the purchase or lease of a vessel; to provide definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Uniform Certificate of Title for Vessels Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #720 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #161 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #720 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #161 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hopper |