GA HB361 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to pharmacists and pharmacies, so as to enact the "Safe Medications Practice Act"; to provide for a short title; to provide legislative intent; to provide definitions; to provide for collaboration between physicians, hospital pharmacists, and other clinical health care practitioners on drug management therapy for a patient in an institutional setting; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Safe Medications Practice Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #710 - Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 392 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-11 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-10 | House First Readers |