GA HB368 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to insurance, so as to provide for the division of a domestic insurer into two or more resulting domestic insurers; to amend Part 1 of Article 13 of Chapter 2 of Title 14 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the right to dissent and obtain payment for shares, so as to add the right to dissent and obtain payment for shares for a division of a domestic insurer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; division of a domestic insurer into two or more resulting domestic insurers; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #202 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #135 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-18SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-19HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback