GA HB371 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 11 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions regarding the uniform rules of the road, so as to require the securing or containing of live animals in the back of motor vehicles operated on certain highways; to provide for a penalty; to specify the basis for probable cause; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform rules of the road; securing or containing of live animals in the back of motor vehicles operated on certain highways; require
Sponsors
Rep. Karla Drenner [D] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55132 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/181877 |