GA HB379 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county special purpose local option sales tax (SPLOST), so as to revise the annual reporting requirements regarding projects and purposes using SPLOST funds; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; projects and purposes using SPLOST funds; revise annual reporting requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Moore [D] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] |
Rep. El-Mahdi Holly [D] | Sen. Josh McLaurin [D] | Sen. Zahra Karinshak [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #364 (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #365 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #199 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #365 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #199 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 236 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |