GA HB380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act granting a new charter to the City of Dawsonville, approved April 6, 1967 (Ga. L. 1967, p. 2748), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 4, 1996 (Ga. L. 1996, p. 4135), so as to provide for the election of members of the city council by district; to provide for the description of the election districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for manner of election; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for the application of general law; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dawsonville, City of; election of members of the city council by district; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #194 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #80 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30 Effective Date
2019-04-30 Act 113
2019-04-30HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback