GA HB381 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 44 of the O.C.G.A., relating to landlord and tenant, so as to enact a new article to provide for the classification of abandoned mobile homes as derelict or intact for purposes of disposal or creation of liens; to provide for procedure for requesting classification of an abandoned mobile home as intact or derelict; to provide for notice; to provide for creation of a lien on abandoned mobile homes deemed to be intact; to provide the opportunity for a hearing to confirm classification as a derelict abandoned mobile home; to provide for court authority to order the disposal of abandoned mobile homes found to be derelict; to provide for the voluntary discharge of a tax lien upon a derelict mobile home by the state or a local governing authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Abandoned Mobile Home Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Darrel Ealum [D] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #836 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #627 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #513 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #627 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #513 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 428 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House Hopper |