GA HB387 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 44-14-320 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to certain liens established and removal of nonconforming liens, so as to provide for liens in favor of private, nonprofit, volunteer fire departments for instances of fire services that are requested by property owners; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; liens in favor of private, nonprofit, volunteer fire departments for instances of fire services that are requested by property owners; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #210 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #156 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #156 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 68 | |
2019-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hopper |