GA HB39 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 33 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to physical therapists, so as to revise licensing provisions; to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Act"; to authorize the State Board of Physical Therapy to administer the compact in this state; to provide definitions; to provide for criminal history records checks for licensing purposes; to provide for conditions; to provide for eligibility; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Act; enter into an interstate compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #361 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #295 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Vote #105 (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-04-23 Act 37
2019-04-23HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-04SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-21HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback