GA HB392 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 45-7-21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to expense allowance and travel cost reimbursement for members of certain boards and commissions, so as to provide expense allowance and travel cost reimbursement for members of the Board of Public Safety in like fashion as other state boards and commissions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Public Safety; expense allowance and travel cost reimbursement for members in like fashion as other state boards and commissions; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #382 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #270 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #188 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #270 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #188 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-29 | Act 75 | |
2019-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hopper |