GA HB405 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property tax exemptions, so as to modify provisions related to the Level 1 Freeport Exemption to include affiliated entities and inventory held for the repair or modification of goods; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Level 1 Freeport Exemption; modify provisions
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #220 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #224 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #194 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #224 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #194 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 250 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hopper |