GA HB417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to provide for the comprehensive regulation of trauma scene cleanup services; to provide for definitions; to provide for registration requirements; to provide for qualifications; to provide for penalties for violations; to provide for emergencies; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for exemptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Law enforcement officers and agencies; comprehensive regulation of trauma scene cleanup services; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #729 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Vote #476 (Y: 147 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Vote #476 (Y: 147 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-04 | Act 566 | |
2020-08-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Hopper |