GA HB419 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to define the terms "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; to revise provisions relating to partnership returns and adjustments; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Internal Revenue Code and Internal Revenue Code of 1986; define terms and incorporate certain provisions of federal law into Georgia law
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #195 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #204 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #112 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #204 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #112 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 266 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Hopper |